Manufacturer: Nine Elms Works
Builder | Nine Elms Works |
Order Date | 1897 |
For | 25 Steam locomotives |
Class | M7 |
Built For | LSWR |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
242 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 03/1897 | 08/1958 | ||
243 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 03/1897 | 09/1958 | ||
244 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 03/1897 | 10/1957 | ||
245 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 04/1897 | 17/11/1962 | ||
246 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 04/1897 | 28/10/1961 | ||
247 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 04/1897 | 14/10/1961 | ||
248 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 05/1897 | 22/07/1961 | ||
249 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 05/1897 | 07/07/1963 | ||
250 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 05/1897 | 31/08/1957 | ||
251 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 06/1897 | 07/07/1963 | ||
252 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 08/1897 | 07/02/1959 | ||
253 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 08/1897 | 07/10/1961 | ||
254 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 08/1897 | 10/05/1964 | ||
255 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 08/1897 | 10/09/1960 | ||
256 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 08/1897 | 23/05/1959 | ||
667 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 09/1897 | 25/02/1961 | ||
668 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 09/1897 | 09/09/1961 | ||
669 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 09/1897 | 22/07/1961 | ||
670 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 10/1897 | 30/03/1963 | ||
671 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 10/1897 | 11/07/1959 | ||
672 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 10/1897 | 29/05/1948 | ||
673 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 11/1897 | 06/08/1960 | ||
674 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 11/1897 | 26/08/1961 | ||
675 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 11/1897 | 22/03/1958 | ||
676 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 11/1897 | 22/07/1961 |