Manufacturer: Nine Elms Works
Builder | Nine Elms Works |
Order Date | 1906 |
For | 5 Steam locomotives |
Class | M7 |
Built For | LSWR |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
56 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 01/1906 | 08/12/1963 | ||
57 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 01/1906 | 23/06/1963 | ||
58 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 03/1906 | 24/09/1960 | ||
59 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 03/1906 | 25/02/1961 | ||
60 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 03/1906 | 22/07/1961 |