Manufacturer: Nine Elms Works
Builder | Nine Elms Works |
Order Date | 1900 |
For | 5 Steam locomotives |
Class | M7 |
Built For | LSWR |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
112 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 07/1900 | 02/02/1963 | ||
318 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 08/1900 | 19/12/1959 | ||
319 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 08/1900 | 23/01/1960 | ||
320 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 08/1900 | 02/03/1963 | ||
321 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 08/1900 | 29/09/1962 |