Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 01/1921 |
For | 6 Steam locomotives |
Class | C16 |
Information | Atlas Works |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
511 | 22683 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 02/1921 | 09/10/1959 | |
512 | 22684 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 02/1921 | 01/08/1955 | |
513 | 22685 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 02/1921 | 02/11/1955 | |
514 | 22686 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 03/1921 | 22/10/1959 | |
515 | 22687 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 03/1921 | 22/04/1960 | |
516 | 22688 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 03/1921 | 22/04/1960 |