Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 31 Today
» 918 Yesterday
» 31 Week
» 17792 Month
» 307184 Year
» 818286 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L739
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 11/1920
For 15 Steam locomotives
Class J37
Information Atlas Works

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
46 22668 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 12/1920 29/12/1962  
72 22669 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 12/1920 12/1963  
73 22670 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 12/1920 11/02/1963  
84 22671 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 12/1920 19/11/1966  
109 22672 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 12/1920 12/1963  
110 22673 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 12/1920 22/04/1967  
111 22674 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 01/1921 05/1965  
171 22675 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 01/1921 29/12/1962  
175 22676 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 01/1921 19/11/1966  
272 22677 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 01/1921 01/1966  
273 22678 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 01/1921 09/1965  
299 22679 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 02/1921 11/1963  
506 22680 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 02/1921 10/1963  
507 22681 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 02/1921 29/03/1962  
508 22682 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 02/1921 10/1963