Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 249 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 249 Week
» 11542 Month
» 276175 Year
» 1497740 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L734
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 1920
For 50 Steam locomotives
Class N2
Information N2/1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1721 22577 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 12/1920 01/08/1957  
1722 22578 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 12/1920 20/11/1957  
1723 22579 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 12/1920 12/05/1958  
1724 22580 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 12/1920 03/01/1957  
1725 22581 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 12/1920 23/09/1962  
1726 22582 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 12/1920 10/11/1960  
1727 22583 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 12/1920 31/05/1961  
1728 22584 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 12/1920 22/04/1960  
1729 22585 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 01/1921 03/12/1959  
1730 22586 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 01/1921 22/10/1960  
1731 22587 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 01/1921 04/11/1959  
1732 22588 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 01/1921 15/12/1960  
1733 22589 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 01/1921 24/07/1962  
1734 22590 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 01/1921 29/05/1961  
1735 22591 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 02/1921 22/09/1955  
1736 22592 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 02/1921 22/07/1959  
1737 22593 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 02/1921 26/01/1961  
1738 22594 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 02/1921 08/08/1959  
1739 22595 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 02/1921 16/01/1961  
1740 22596 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 02/1921 10/1957  
1741 22597 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 02/1921 23/09/1962  
1742 22598 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 02/1921 01/06/1961  
1743 22599 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 02/1921 23/11/1959  
1744 22600 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 02/1921 16/09/1962  
1745 22601 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 02/1921 02/11/1959  
1746 22602 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 02/1921 04/03/1959  
1747 22603 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1921 10/08/1959  
1748 22604 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1921 11/06/1958  
1749 22605 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1921 25/11/1959  
1750 22606 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1921 23/09/1962  
1751 22607 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1921 12/1959  
1752 22608 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1921 07/07/1961  
1753 22609 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1921 02/06/1959  
1754 22610 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1921 26/09/1961  
1755 22611 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1921 09/02/1959  
1756 22612 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1921 16/09/1962  
1757 22613 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1921 02/06/1959  
1758 22614 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1921 27/04/1959  
1759 22615 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1921 16/09/1962  
1760 22616 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1921 06/07/1959  
1761 22617 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1921 21/07/1960  
1762 22618 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1921 06/08/1959  
1763 22619 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1921 06/04/1959  
1764 22620 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1921 11/09/1961  
1765 22621 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1921 08/12/1958  
1766 22622 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1921 20/07/1959  
1767 22623 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1921 23/09/1962  
1768 22624 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1921 10/06/1959  
1769 22625 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1921 24/07/1959  
1770 22626 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1921 12/09/1961