Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 1920 |
For | 50 Steam locomotives |
Class | N2 |
Information | N2/1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1721 | 22577 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 12/1920 | 01/08/1957 | |
1722 | 22578 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 12/1920 | 20/11/1957 | |
1723 | 22579 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 12/1920 | 12/05/1958 | |
1724 | 22580 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 12/1920 | 03/01/1957 | |
1725 | 22581 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 12/1920 | 23/09/1962 | |
1726 | 22582 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 12/1920 | 10/11/1960 | |
1727 | 22583 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 12/1920 | 31/05/1961 | |
1728 | 22584 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 12/1920 | 22/04/1960 | |
1729 | 22585 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 01/1921 | 03/12/1959 | |
1730 | 22586 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 01/1921 | 22/10/1960 | |
1731 | 22587 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 01/1921 | 04/11/1959 | |
1732 | 22588 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 01/1921 | 15/12/1960 | |
1733 | 22589 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 01/1921 | 24/07/1962 | |
1734 | 22590 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 01/1921 | 29/05/1961 | |
1735 | 22591 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 02/1921 | 22/09/1955 | |
1736 | 22592 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 02/1921 | 22/07/1959 | |
1737 | 22593 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 02/1921 | 26/01/1961 | |
1738 | 22594 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 02/1921 | 08/08/1959 | |
1739 | 22595 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 02/1921 | 16/01/1961 | |
1740 | 22596 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 02/1921 | 10/1957 | |
1741 | 22597 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 02/1921 | 23/09/1962 | |
1742 | 22598 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 02/1921 | 01/06/1961 | |
1743 | 22599 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 02/1921 | 23/11/1959 | |
1744 | 22600 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 02/1921 | 16/09/1962 | |
1745 | 22601 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 02/1921 | 02/11/1959 | |
1746 | 22602 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 02/1921 | 04/03/1959 | |
1747 | 22603 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 03/1921 | 10/08/1959 | |
1748 | 22604 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 03/1921 | 11/06/1958 | |
1749 | 22605 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 03/1921 | 25/11/1959 | |
1750 | 22606 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 03/1921 | 23/09/1962 | |
1751 | 22607 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 03/1921 | 12/1959 | |
1752 | 22608 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 03/1921 | 07/07/1961 | |
1753 | 22609 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 03/1921 | 02/06/1959 | |
1754 | 22610 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 03/1921 | 26/09/1961 | |
1755 | 22611 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 03/1921 | 09/02/1959 | |
1756 | 22612 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 03/1921 | 16/09/1962 | |
1757 | 22613 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 03/1921 | 02/06/1959 | |
1758 | 22614 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 03/1921 | 27/04/1959 | |
1759 | 22615 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 04/1921 | 16/09/1962 | |
1760 | 22616 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 04/1921 | 06/07/1959 | |
1761 | 22617 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 04/1921 | 21/07/1960 | |
1762 | 22618 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 04/1921 | 06/08/1959 | |
1763 | 22619 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 04/1921 | 06/04/1959 | |
1764 | 22620 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 04/1921 | 11/09/1961 | |
1765 | 22621 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 04/1921 | 08/12/1958 | |
1766 | 22622 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 04/1921 | 20/07/1959 | |
1767 | 22623 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 04/1921 | 23/09/1962 | |
1768 | 22624 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 04/1921 | 10/06/1959 | |
1769 | 22625 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 04/1921 | 24/07/1959 | |
1770 | 22626 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 04/1921 | 12/09/1961 |