Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 10/1919 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | J37 |
Information | Atlas Works |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
470 | 22268 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1919 | 05/04/1961 | |
471 | 22269 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1919 | 22/08/1966 | |
472 | 22270 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1919 | 06/09/1962 | |
473 | 22271 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1919 | 02/10/1965 | |
313 | 22272 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1919 | 03/03/1966 | |
485 | 22273 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1919 | 09/07/1963 | |
486 | 22274 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1919 | 29/12/1962 | |
487 | 22275 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1919 | 22/04/1967 | |
488 | 22276 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1919 | 16/12/1963 | |
489 | 22277 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1919 | 27/08/1962 | |
296 | 22490 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1919 | 08/06/1964 | |
300 | 22491 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1919 | 14/07/1966 | |
301 | 22492 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1919 | 13/08/1962 | |
302 | 22493 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1919 | 24/08/1966 | |
303 | 22494 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 01/1920 | 29/12/1962 | |
306 | 22495 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 01/1920 | 01/02/1966 | |
401 | 22496 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 01/1920 | 22/04/1967 | |
402 | 22497 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 01/1920 | 29/12/1962 | |
403 | 22498 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 01/1920 | 23/01/1964 | |
491 | 22499 | J37 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 01/1920 | 17/12/1964 |