Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 31 Today
» 918 Yesterday
» 31 Week
» 17792 Month
» 307184 Year
» 818286 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L695
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 05/1918
For 34 Steam locomotives
Class J37
Information Atlas Works

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
88 21925 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 06/1918 17/12/1962  
89 21926 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 06/1918 10/1963  
123 21927 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 06/1918 09/1965  
139 21928 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 06/1918 11/1963  
151 21929 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 07/1918 03/1961  
157 21930 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 07/1918 05/1964  
158 21931 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 07/1918 11/1963  
161 21932 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 07/1918 10/1964  
162 21933 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 07/1918 06/1964  
167 21934 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 07/1918 10/1961  
274 21935 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 08/1918 09/04/1962  
295 21936 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 08/1918 08/1963  
305 21937 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 08/1918 10/1965  
314 21938 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 08/1918 09/1964  
315 21939 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 08/1918 10/1964  
456 21940 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 08/1918 04/1967  
457 21941 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 09/1918 08/1966  
458 21942 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 09/1918 21/05/1962  
459 21943 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 09/1918 12/1963  
460 21944 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 09/1918 10/1965  
461 21945 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 10/1918 29/12/1962  
462 21946 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 10/1918 11/1963  
463 21947 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 10/1918 12/1963  
464 21948 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 10/1918 07/1959  
465 21949 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 11/1918 30/12/1964  
466 21950 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 11/1918 06/1964  
467 21951 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 11/1918 06/1964  
468 21952 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 11/1918 06/1966  
469 21953 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 11/1918 05/1963  
476 21954 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 12/1918 14/05/1962  
477 21955 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 01/1919 10/1964  
478 21956 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 01/1919 07/1965  
479 21957 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 01/1919 11/1963  
480 21958 J37 NBR Reid 0-6-0 01/1919 29/12/1962