Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 294 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 5802 Week
» 26704 Month
» 26704 Year
» 1248269 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L653
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 1916
For 12 Steam locomotives
Class N15
Information Atlas Works

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
47 21218 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 08/1916 13/11/1958  
54 21219 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 08/1916 12/01/1961  
61 21220 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 09/1916 15/11/1958  
65 21221 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 09/1916 07/10/1958  
69 21222 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 10/1916 12/08/1959  
70 21223 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 12/1916 09/08/1960  
276 21224 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 01/1917 29/09/1960  
453 21225 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 01/1917 20/03/1961  
142 21226 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 02/1917 12/02/1962  
165 21227 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 03/1917 02/09/1959  
166 21228 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 03/1917 13/11/1961  
259 21229 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 03/1917 23/11/1960