Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 01/1915 |
For | 15 Steam locomotives |
Class | C16 |
Information | Atlas Works |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
438 | 21203 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 12/1915 | 09/10/1959 | |
439 | 21204 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 12/1915 | 20/04/1956 | |
440 | 21205 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 12/1915 | 22/04/1960 | |
441 | 21206 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 12/1915 | 03/04/1961 | |
442 | 21207 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 12/1915 | 22/04/1960 | |
443 | 21208 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 01/1916 | 22/10/1959 | |
444 | 21209 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 02/1916 | 09/10/1959 | |
445 | 21210 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 02/1916 | 15/02/1961 | |
446 | 21211 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 02/1916 | 22/04/1960 | |
447 | 21212 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 03/1916 | 02/03/1960 | |
448 | 21213 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 04/1916 | 02/03/1960 | |
449 | 21214 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 04/1916 | 13/04/1956 | |
450 | 21215 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 04/1916 | 15/02/1961 | |
451 | 21216 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 04/1916 | 08/05/1956 | |
452 | 21217 | C16 | NBR | Reid | 4-4-2T | 05/1916 | 02/03/1960 |