Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 379 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 5887 Week
» 26789 Month
» 26789 Year
» 1248354 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L528
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 1913
For 9 Steam locomotives
Class N15
Information Queens Park Works

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
219 20164 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 05/1913 27/07/1959  
223 20165 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 05/1913 15/04/1959  
224 20166 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 05/1913 19/05/1960  
229 20167 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 05/1913 07/12/1959  
230 20168 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 05/1913 20/12/1957  
246 20169 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 05/1913 05/02/1960  
252 20170 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 05/1913 09/02/1959  
257 20171 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 05/1913 06/01/1960  
264 20172 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 05/1913 16/06/1960