Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 1912 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | N15 |
Information | Queens Park Works |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
907 | 19828 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 07/1912 | 25/02/1960 | |
908 | 19829 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 07/1912 | 11/03/1960 | |
909 | 19830 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 07/1912 | 07/07/1959 | |
910 | 19831 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 06/06/1958 | |
911 | 19832 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 06/06/1958 | |
912 | 19833 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 22/03/1960 | |
913 | 19834 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 01/10/1962 | |
914 | 19835 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 23/02/1959 | |
915 | 19836 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 30/12/1958 | |
916 | 19837 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 22/09/1958 | |
917 | 19838 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 18/11/1959 | |
918 | 19839 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 08/09/1962 | |
919 | 19840 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 12/02/1962 | |
920 | 19841 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 09/04/1958 | |
921 | 19842 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 18/05/1958 | |
922 | 19843 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 30/10/1961 | |
923 | 19844 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 14/08/1958 | |
924 | 19845 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 16/08/1960 | |
925 | 19846 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 02/03/1959 | |
926 | 19847 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 08/1912 | 12/02/1962 |