Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 281 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 5789 Week
» 26691 Month
» 26691 Year
» 1248256 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L394
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 1910
For 18 Steam locomotives
Class N15
Information The first six engines had westinghouse brakes and were classified by the LNER as N15/2. The remaining 12 were Steam braked and were N15/1. Hyde Park Works.

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
7 19159 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 06/1910 12/02/1962  
154 19160 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 06/1910 16/06/1959  
209 19161 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 06/1910 01/10/1962  
210 19162 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 06/1910 02/12/1958  
251 19163 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 06/1910 27/12/1957  
282 19164 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 07/1910 12/02/1962  
386 19165 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 06/1910 18/11/1960  
387 19166 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 06/1910 03/08/1960  
388 19167 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 07/1910 02/03/1961  
389 19168 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 07/1910 01/10/1962  
390 19169 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 07/1910 11/05/1961  
391 19170 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 07/1910 21/05/1962  
392 19171 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 07/1910 01/10/1962  
393 19172 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 07/1910 26/04/1958  
396 19173 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 08/1910 13/06/1958  
397 19174 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 08/1910 02/09/1960  
398 19175 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 08/1910 24/01/1958  
399 19176 N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 08/1910 16/09/1960