Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 08/1909 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J35 |
Information | Atlas Works |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
364 | 18955 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1909 | 06/06/1961 | |
365 | 18956 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1909 | 20/06/1958 | |
366 | 18957 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1909 | 06/10/1959 | |
367 | 18958 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1909 | 09/04/1962 | |
368 | 18959 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 11/1909 | 21/09/1959 | |
369 | 18960 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1909 | 27/10/1962 | |
370 | 18961 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1909 | 09/06/1961 | |
371 | 18962 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1909 | 06/08/1959 | |
372 | 18963 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1909 | 21/09/1960 | |
373 | 18964 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 12/1909 | 09/1947 |