Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 01/1906 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J35 |
Information | Atlas Works |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
848 | 17322 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 06/1906 | 04/09/1959 | |
849 | 17323 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 06/1906 | 02/10/1961 | |
850 | 17324 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 06/1906 | 01/12/1960 | |
851 | 17325 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 06/1906 | 16/09/1960 | |
852 | 17326 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 06/1906 | 30/05/1958 | |
853 | 17327 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 06/1906 | 12/1947 | |
854 | 17328 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 06/1906 | 09/07/1959 | |
855 | 17329 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 06/1906 | 11/1947 | |
856 | 17330 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 06/1906 | 27/05/1960 | |
857 | 17331 | J35 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0 | 06/1906 | 12/1946 |