Manufacturer: Manning, Wardle & Co.
Builder | Manning, Wardle & Co. |
Order Date | 1907 |
For | 7 Steam locomotives |
Class | O4 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 1698 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 04/1907 | 24/08/1953 | |
43 | 1699 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 04/1907 | 07/12/1949 | |
59 | 1700 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 06/1907 | 27/07/1951 | |
67 | 1701 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 07/1907 | 17/07/1950 | |
68 | 1702 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 07/1907 | 23/06/1951 | |
69 | 1703 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 08/1907 | 08/04/1951 | |
94 | 1704 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 09/1907 | 19/09/1949 |