Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1094 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3739 Week
» 6321 Month
» 270954 Year
» 1492519 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Horwich Works



Order Details for Lot No: HO/HO199
Builder Horwich Works
Order Date 1949
For 30 Steam locomotives
Class Black Five

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
44668   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 24/12/1949 09/04/1966  
44669   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/12/1949 14/10/1967  
44670   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/01/1950 15/01/1966  
44671   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 28/02/1950 18/02/1967  
44672   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 28/02/1950 02/03/1968  
44673   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 28/02/1950 15/05/1965  
44674   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/03/1950 30/12/1967  
44675   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/03/1950 23/09/1967  
44676   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/04/1950 04/07/1964  
44677   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/04/1950 28/10/1967  
44678   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/05/1950 25/11/1967  
44679   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/05/1950 23/09/1967  
44680   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/06/1950 16/09/1967  
44681   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 17/06/1950 16/09/1967  
44682   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 17/06/1950 11/1967  
44683   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/07/1950 13/04/1968  
44684   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/07/1950 16/09/1967  
44685   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/08/1950 22/04/1967  
44686   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/04/1951 16/10/1965  
44687   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/05/1951 22/01/1966  
44688   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/08/1950 20/08/1966  
44689   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/09/1950 04/03/1967  
44690   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/10/1950 03/08/1968  
44691   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/10/1950 01/04/1967  
44692   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/10/1950 14/05/1966  
44693   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/1950 29/05/1967  
44694   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/1950 10/1967  
44695   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/11/1950 24/06/1967  
44696   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/11/1950 13/05/1967  
44697   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/11/1950 18/11/1967