Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 417 Today
» 1522 Yesterday
» 8154 Week
» 19859 Month
» 351348 Year
» 427935 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Horwich Works



Order Details for Lot No: HO/HO199
Builder Horwich Works
Order Date 1949
For 30 Steam locomotives
Class Black Five

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
44668   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 24/12/1949 04/1966  
44669   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/12/1949 10/1967  
44670   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/01/1950 01/1966  
44671   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 28/02/1950 02/1967  
44672   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 28/02/1950 03/1968  
44673   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 28/02/1950 05/1965  
44674   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/03/1950 12/1967  
44675   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/03/1950 09/1967  
44676   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/04/1950 07/1964  
44677   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/04/1950 10/1967  
44678   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/05/1950 11/1967  
44679   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/05/1950 09/1967  
44680   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/06/1950 09/1967  
44681   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 17/06/1950 09/1967  
44682   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 17/06/1950 11/1967  
44683   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/07/1950 04/1968  
44684   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/07/1950 09/1967  
44685   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/08/1950 04/1967  
44686   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/04/1951 10/1965  
44687   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/05/1951 01/1966  
44688   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/08/1950 08/1966  
44689   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/09/1950 03/1967  
44690   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/10/1950 08/1968  
44691   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/10/1950 04/1967  
44692   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/10/1950 05/1966  
44693   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/1950 05/1967  
44694   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/1950 10/1967  
44695   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/11/1950 06/1967  
44696   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/11/1950 05/1967  
44697   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/11/1950 11/1967