Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 889 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6494 Week
» 18041 Month
» 417723 Year
» 494310 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Horwich Works



Order Details for Lot No: HO/HO192
Builder Horwich Works
Order Date 1948
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class Black Five

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
44698   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 03/07/1948 07/1966  
44699   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 10/07/1948 05/1967  
44700   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/07/1948 07/1966  
44701   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 07/08/1948 05/1964  
44702   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 21/08/1948 06/1965  
44703   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 28/08/1948 12/1966  
44704   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 04/09/1948 09/1966  
44705   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/09/1948 09/1966  
44706   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 18/09/1948 12/1963  
44707   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 25/09/1948 01/1966  
44708   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 02/10/1948 01/1968  
44709   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 09/10/1948 08/1968  
44710   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 16/10/1948 12/1966  
44711   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 23/10/1948 05/1968  
44712   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/10/1948 11/1966  
44713   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 06/11/1948 08/1968  
44714   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 13/11/1948 11/1966  
44715   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 20/11/1948 01/1968  
44716   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 27/11/1948 07/1965  
44717   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 04/12/1948 08/1967