Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1011 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4871 Week
» 7453 Month
» 272086 Year
» 1493651 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Hawthorn Leslie



Order Details for Lot No: HL/HL489
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
Order Date 1913
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class N13

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
13 3008 N13 HBR Stirling 0-6-2T 11/1913 26/06/1948  
15 3009 N13 HBR Stirling 0-6-2T 12/1913 21/08/1952  
18 3010 N13 HBR Stirling 0-6-2T 12/1913 24/11/1952  
23 3011 N13 HBR Stirling 0-6-2T 12/1913 04/05/1953  
27 3012 N13 HBR Stirling 0-6-2T 01/1914 22/10/1956  
152 3013 N13 HBR Stirling 0-6-2T 01/1914 18/05/1955  
153 3014 N13 HBR Stirling 0-6-2T 02/1914 20/12/1954  
154 3015 N13 HBR Stirling 0-6-2T 02/1914 05/07/1955  
155 3016 N13 HBR Stirling 0-6-2T 03/1914 26/05/1952  
156 3017 N13 HBR Stirling 0-6-2T 03/1914 05/07/1955