Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 230 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 230 Week
» 11523 Month
» 276156 Year
» 1497721 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Hawthorn Leslie



Order Details for Lot No: HL/HL375
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
Order Date 10/1927
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class N2
Information N2/4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2662 3691 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 10/1928 16/09/1962  
2663 3692 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 10/1928 23/03/1959  
2664 3693 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 10/1928 15/12/1959  
2665 3694 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 11/1928 01/06/1961  
2666 3695 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 11/1928 11/03/1961  
2667 3696 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 11/1928 24/11/1958  
2668 3697 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 11/1928 14/02/1961  
2669 3698 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 11/1928 16/09/1962  
2670 3699 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 12/1928 22/07/1959  
2671 3700 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 12/1928 05/05/1959  
2672 3701 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 01/1929 25/11/1959  
2673 3702 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 02/1929 16/09/1962  
2674 3703 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1929 11/09/1961  
2675 3704 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1929 01/12/1960  
2676 3705 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1929 26/09/1960  
2677 3706 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1929 16/09/1962  
2678 3707 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1929 10/07/1959  
2679 3708 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1929 23/09/1961  
2680 3709 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 05/1929 03/03/1961  
2681 3710 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 05/1929 11/07/1960