Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 165 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7172 Week
» 13306 Month
» 241190 Year
» 1462755 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/GOxxx
Builder Gorton Works
Order Date 12/1947
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class B1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
61342 1000 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 03/01/1949 31/12/1966  
61343 1001 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 04/02/1949 03/03/1966  
61344 1002 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 05/03/1949 23/09/1966  
61345 1003 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 08/04/1949 14/07/1966  
61346 1004 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 30/04/1949 08/06/1964  
61347 1005 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 21/05/1949 04/04/1967  
61348 1006 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 09/06/1949 26/12/1965  
61349 1007 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 02/07/1949 17/08/1966  
61340 998 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 27/11/1948 22/04/1967  
61341 999 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 18/12/1948 28/12/1963