Manufacturer: Gorton Works
Builder | Gorton Works |
Order Date | 12/1947 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | B1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
61342 | 1000 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 03/01/1949 | 31/12/1966 | |
61343 | 1001 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 04/02/1949 | 03/03/1966 | |
61344 | 1002 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 05/03/1949 | 23/09/1966 | |
61345 | 1003 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 08/04/1949 | 14/07/1966 | |
61346 | 1004 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 30/04/1949 | 08/06/1964 | |
61347 | 1005 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 21/05/1949 | 04/04/1967 | |
61348 | 1006 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 09/06/1949 | 26/12/1965 | |
61349 | 1007 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 02/07/1949 | 17/08/1966 | |
61340 | 998 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 27/11/1948 | 22/04/1967 | |
61341 | 999 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 18/12/1948 | 28/12/1963 |