Manufacturer: Gorton Works
Builder | Gorton Works |
Order Date | 1927 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | N7 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2632 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 11/1927 | 05/10/1959 | ||
2633 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 11/1927 | 10/09/1961 | ||
2634 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 11/1927 | 12/06/1961 | ||
2635 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 11/1927 | 26/06/1961 | ||
2636 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 12/1927 | 16/02/1959 | ||
2637 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 12/1927 | 24/11/1960 | ||
2638 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 01/1928 | 10/09/1961 | ||
2639 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 01/1928 | 17/01/1961 | ||
2640 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 02/1928 | 04/12/1960 | ||
2641 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 02/1928 | 04/12/1960 |