Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 580 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4440 Week
» 7022 Month
» 271655 Year
» 1493220 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/GO382
Builder Gorton Works
Order Date 1926
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class N7

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
826   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 01/1926 16/09/1962  
827   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 02/1926 10/08/1959  
828   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 02/1926 13/01/1959  
829   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 02/1926 09/03/1959  
830   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 03/1926 24/11/1960  
832   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 04/1926 31/03/1959  
833   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 04/1926 19/05/1959  
834   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 05/1926 05/01/1959  
837   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 06/1926 16/09/1962  
838   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 06/1926 01/12/1958  
850   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 07/1926 24/11/1960  
851   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 07/1926 19/05/1958  
852   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 09/1926 27/01/1959  
853   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 09/1926 01/11/1960  
865   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1926 16/09/1962  
866   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1926 24/11/1960  
867   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1926 29/08/1960  
868   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1926 27/07/1959  
870   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1926 19/05/1959  
873   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 02/1927 13/01/1961