Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 613 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4473 Week
» 7055 Month
» 271688 Year
» 1493253 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Gorton Works



Order Details for Lot No: GO/GO381
Builder Gorton Works
Order Date 1925
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class N7

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
409   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 08/1925 24/11/1959  
421   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 09/1925 12/02/1959  
426   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1925 01/12/1958  
456   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1925 17/04/1959  
457   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1925 08/06/1959  
460   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1925 23/03/1959  
464   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1925 01/12/1958  
471   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1925 29/08/1960  
473   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1925 24/11/1960  
475   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1925 23/01/1961