Manufacturer: Gateshead Works
Builder | Gateshead Works |
Order Date | 1907 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | D20 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1217 | D20 | NER | Worsdell | 4-4-0 | 05/1907 | 06/09/1954 | ||
1223 | D20 | NER | Worsdell | 4-4-0 | 09/1907 | 29/11/1948 | ||
1232 | D20 | NER | Worsdell | 4-4-0 | 05/1907 | 07/06/1951 | ||
1234 | D20 | NER | Worsdell | 4-4-0 | 05/1907 | 05/1943 | ||
1235 | D20 | NER | Worsdell | 4-4-0 | 09/1907 | 31/05/1954 | ||
1236 | D20 | NER | Worsdell | 4-4-0 | 06/1907 | 12/1947 | ||
1258 | D20 | NER | Worsdell | 4-4-0 | 09/1907 | 05/1946 | ||
1260 | D20 | NER | Worsdell | 4-4-0 | 06/1907 | 20/11/1957 | ||
1665 | D20 | NER | Worsdell | 4-4-0 | 09/1907 | 12/1957 | ||
1672 | D20 | NER | Worsdell | 4-4-0 | 09/1907 | 04/02/1957 |