Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1894 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J53 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
971 | 657 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 08/1894 | 13/04/1953 | |
972 | 658 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 09/1894 | 20/07/1953 | |
973 | 659 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 10/1894 | 14/07/1952 | |
974 | 660 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 11/1894 | 26/10/1953 | |
975 | 661 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 12/1894 | 29/11/1954 | |
976 | 662 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 12/1894 | 03/07/1957 | |
977 | 681 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 05/1895 | 27/04/1953 | |
978 | 682 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 06/1895 | 25/01/1954 | |
979 | 683 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 08/1895 | 13/12/1954 | |
980 | 684 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 10/1895 | 11/1936 |