Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1892 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J53 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
921 | 591 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 12/1892 | 07/1939 | |
922 | 597 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 12/1892 | 29/11/1954 | |
923 | 599 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 02/1893 | 25/11/1955 | |
924 | 600 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 02/1893 | 03/1936 | |
925 | 603 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 03/1893 | 19/07/1956 | |
926 | 605 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 03/1893 | 09/11/1954 | |
927 | 608 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 04/1893 | 27/05/1957 | |
928 | 612 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 05/1893 | 11/1935 | |
929 | 613 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 06/1893 | 06/08/1951 | |
930 | 615 | J53 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0ST | 06/1893 | 10/1950 |