Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 06/1944 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | A2 |
Information | A2/3 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
500 | 2000 | A2 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-2 | 24/05/1946 | 16/06/1963 | |
511 | 2002 | A2 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-2 | 20/07/1946 | 12/11/1962 | |
512 | 2003 | A2 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-2 | 24/08/1946 | 19/06/1965 | |
513 | 2004 | A2 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-2 | 31/08/1946 | 27/04/1963 | |
514 | 2005 | A2 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-2 | 28/09/1946 | 29/12/1962 | |
515 | 2006 | A2 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-2 | 19/10/1946 | 12/11/1962 | |
516 | 2007 | A2 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-2 | 02/11/1946 | 12/11/1962 | |
517 | 2008 | A2 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-2 | 28/11/1946 | 12/11/1962 | |
518 | 2009 | A2 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-2 | 28/12/1946 | 12/11/1962 | |
519 | 2010 | A2 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-2 | 01/02/1947 | 18/12/1962 |