Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 19/02/1941 |
For | 4 Diesel locomotives |
Class | DES1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
8000 | 1960 | DES1 | BR | 0-6-0 | 12/08/1944 | 05/08/1967 | ||
8001 | 1963 | DES1 | BR | 0-6-0 | 12/08/1944 | 15/04/1967 | ||
8002 | 1973 | DES1 | BR | 0-6-0 | 22/03/1945 | 05/08/1967 | ||
8003 | 1978 | DES1 | BR | 0-6-0 | 22/03/1945 | 06/05/1967 |