Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 661 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4521 Week
» 7103 Month
» 271736 Year
» 1493301 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/312
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 12/1926
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class N7

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2619 1688 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 06/1928 04/12/1960  
2620 1689 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 06/1928 04/12/1960  
2621 1690 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 07/1928 10/09/1961  
2622 1691 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 07/1928 10/09/1961  
2623 1692 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 07/1928 16/09/1962  
2624 1696 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 09/1928 04/12/1960  
2625 1697 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 09/1928 24/11/1960  
2626 1698 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1928 10/09/1961  
2627 1699 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1928 04/12/1960  
2628 1701 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1928 10/09/1961