Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 339 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 339 Week
» 11632 Month
» 276265 Year
» 1497830 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/311
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 1926
For 9 Steam locomotives
Class N7

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2610 1679 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1927 04/12/1960  
2611 1680 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 01/1928 10/09/1961  
2612 1681 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 01/1928 10/09/1961  
2613 1682 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 01/1928 04/12/1960  
2614 1683 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 02/1928 12/02/1959  
2615 1684 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 02/1928 01/01/1959  
2616 1685 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 02/1928 04/12/1960  
2617 1686 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 03/1928 24/11/1960  
2618 1687 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 04/1928 01/11/1960