Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1926 |
For | 9 Steam locomotives |
Class | N7 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2610 | 1679 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 12/1927 | 04/12/1960 | |
2611 | 1680 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 01/1928 | 10/09/1961 | |
2612 | 1681 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 01/1928 | 10/09/1961 | |
2613 | 1682 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 01/1928 | 04/12/1960 | |
2614 | 1683 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 02/1928 | 12/02/1959 | |
2615 | 1684 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 02/1928 | 01/01/1959 | |
2616 | 1685 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 02/1928 | 04/12/1960 | |
2617 | 1686 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 03/1928 | 24/11/1960 | |
2618 | 1687 | N7 | GER | Hill | 0-6-2T | 04/1928 | 01/11/1960 |