Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 218 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 218 Week
» 11511 Month
» 276144 Year
» 1497709 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/310
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 06/1926
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class N7

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2600 1669 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1927 17/03/1961  
2601 1670 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1927 01/01/1959  
2602 1671 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1927 18/10/1960  
2603 1672 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1927 22/06/1959  
2604 1673 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1927 04/12/1960  
2605 1674 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1927 27/04/1961  
2606 1675 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1927 13/01/1961  
2607 1676 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1927 01/11/1960  
2608 1677 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1927 10/09/1961  
2609 1678 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1927 23/11/1959