Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 12/1924 |
For | 6 Steam locomotives |
Class | N2 |
Information | N2/3 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
892 | 1622 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 11/1925 | 12/01/1956 | |
893 | 1623 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 11/1925 | 22/04/1960 | |
894 | 1625 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 11/1925 | 24/06/1961 | |
895 | 1628 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 12/1925 | 17/04/1958 | |
896 | 1629 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 12/1925 | 17/06/1957 | |
897 | 1632 | N2 | GNR | Gresley | 0-6-2T | 12/1925 | 28/04/1959 |