Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 10/1923 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | A1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2543 | 1598 | A1 | GNR | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 28/06/1924 | 16/06/1963 | |
2544 | 1600 | A1 | GNR | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 26/07/1924 | 23/11/1964 | |
2545 | 1601 | A1 | GNR | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 09/08/1924 | 16/06/1963 | |
2546 | 1602 | A1 | GNR | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 30/08/1924 | 08/04/1963 | |
2547 | 1603 | A1 | GNR | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 30/08/1924 | 08/09/1963 | |
2548 | 1604 | A1 | GNR | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 27/09/1924 | 29/12/1962 | |
2549 | 1605 | A1 | GNR | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 25/10/1924 | 11/06/1963 | |
2550 | 1606 | A1 | GNR | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 12/11/1924 | 23/11/1964 | |
2551 | 1607 | A1 | GNR | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 29/11/1924 | 17/01/1966 | |
2552 | 1608 | A1 | GNR | Gresley | 4-6-2 | 11/12/1924 | 27/05/1963 |