Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 309 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 309 Week
» 11602 Month
» 276235 Year
» 1497800 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/292
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 1920
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class N2
Information N2/1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1606 1518 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 12/1920 06/07/1959  
1607 1519 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1921 26/01/1959  
1608 1521 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 05/1921 26/11/1959  
1609 1523 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 06/1921 09/12/1958  
1610 1524 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 06/1921 13/01/1958  
1611 1525 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 07/1921 25/09/1958  
1612 1527 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 08/1921 14/04/1958  
1613 1528 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 08/1921 17/03/1958  
1614 1530 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 08/1921 11/09/1961  
1615 1531 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 08/1921 15/09/1958