Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1919 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J6 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
621 | 1502 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 12/1919 | 01/03/1961 | |
622 | 1503 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 12/1919 | 26/03/1959 | |
623 | 1504 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 12/1919 | 16/02/1959 | |
624 | 1505 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 12/1919 | 08/07/1958 | |
625 | 1506 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 01/1920 | 28/01/1958 | |
626 | 1507 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 02/1920 | 07/07/1961 | |
627 | 1508 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 02/1920 | 29/04/1959 | |
628 | 1510 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 03/1920 | 28/07/1958 | |
629 | 1511 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 05/1920 | 18/01/1961 | |
630 | 1512 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 05/1920 | 31/10/1959 |