Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1918 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J6 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
601 | 1482 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 10/1918 | 08/10/1959 | |
602 | 1483 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 11/1918 | 04/10/1960 | |
603 | 1484 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 11/1918 | 08/07/1958 | |
604 | 1485 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 02/1919 | 14/05/1962 | |
605 | 1486 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 02/1919 | 21/10/1959 | |
606 | 1487 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 03/1919 | 18/08/1958 | |
607 | 1488 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 04/1919 | 29/04/1960 | |
608 | 1489 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 04/1919 | 06/06/1960 | |
609 | 1490 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 04/1919 | 13/05/1959 | |
610 | 1491 | J6 | GNR | Ivatt | 0-6-0 | 05/1919 | 31/08/1959 |