Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 560 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4420 Week
» 7002 Month
» 271635 Year
» 1493200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/267
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 09/1911
For 15 Steam locomotives
Class N1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1581 1326 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1911 07/06/1954  
1582 1327 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1911 03/04/1959  
1583 1328 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1911 28/10/1955  
1584 1329 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 02/1912 08/08/1955  
1585 1330 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 02/1912 10/12/1955  
1586 1331 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 02/1912 04/07/1955  
1587 1332 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 03/1912 02/07/1956  
1588 1333 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 03/1912 08/03/1954  
1589 1334 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 03/1912 15/04/1957  
1590 1335 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 04/1912 06/08/1956  
1591 1336 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 04/1912 16/01/1956  
1592 1337 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 04/1912 01/09/1952  
1593 1338 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 04/1912 21/08/1958  
1594 1339 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 04/1912 13/03/1959  
1595 1340 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 05/1912 11/04/1955