Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 241 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 241 Week
» 11534 Month
» 276167 Year
» 1497732 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/264
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 09/1910
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class N1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1571 1286 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1910 12/10/1955  
1572 1287 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1910 13/03/1959  
1573 1288 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1910 29/04/1958  
1574 1289 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1910 07/02/1955  
1575 1290 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1910 16/05/1955  
1576 1291 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1910 15/11/1954  
1577 1292 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 01/1911 23/04/1957  
1578 1293 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 02/1911 04/11/1955  
1579 1294 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 02/1911 28/03/1955  
1580 1295 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 03/1911 22/08/1955