Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1910 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | C1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1452 | 1276 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 08/1910 | 27/02/1946 | |
1453 | 1277 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 08/1910 | 27/07/1946 | |
1454 | 1278 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 08/1910 | 07/09/1946 | |
1455 | 1279 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 08/1910 | 23/01/1950 | |
1456 | 1280 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 09/1910 | 05/08/1947 | |
1457 | 1281 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 09/1910 | 30/03/1946 | |
1458 | 1282 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 10/1910 | 29/04/1947 | |
1459 | 1283 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 10/1910 | 16/07/1943 | |
1460 | 1284 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 10/1910 | 27/10/1945 | |
1461 | 1285 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 11/1910 | 31/08/1945 |