Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 257 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 257 Week
» 11550 Month
» 276183 Year
» 1497748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/261
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 12/1909
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class N1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1561 1256 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 03/1910 30/05/1955  
1562 1257 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 03/1910 06/09/1953  
1563 1258 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 03/1910 11/03/1959  
1564 1259 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 03/1910 22/10/1956  
1565 1260 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 04/1910 17/01/1955  
1566 1261 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 04/1910 15/06/1953  
1567 1262 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 04/1910 26/10/1956  
1568 1263 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 05/1910 12/01/1953  
1569 1264 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 05/1910 19/04/1955  
1570 1265 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 05/1910 10/03/1959