Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1908 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J52 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1281 | 1216 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 12/1908 | 17/08/1956 | |
1282 | 1217 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 12/1908 | 09/12/1955 | |
1283 | 1218 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 12/1908 | 27/01/1958 | |
1284 | 1219 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 12/1908 | 26/09/1955 | |
1285 | 1220 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 01/1909 | 14/09/1955 | |
1286 | 1221 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 02/1909 | 18/09/1956 | |
1287 | 1222 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 02/1909 | 25/11/1957 | |
1288 | 1223 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 02/1909 | 26/08/1957 | |
1289 | 1224 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 02/1909 | 21/10/1957 | |
1290 | 1225 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 03/1909 | 30/05/1955 |