Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 653 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4513 Week
» 7095 Month
» 271728 Year
» 1493293 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Doncaster Works



Order Details for Lot No: DO/254
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Date 09/1907
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class N1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1551 1176 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1907 07/03/1955  
1552 1177 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1907 08/11/1954  
1553 1178 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1907 27/12/1954  
1554 1179 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1907 10/03/1959  
1555 1180 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1907 21/03/1955  
1556 1181 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1907 11/07/1955  
1557 1182 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1907 19/07/1954  
1558 1183 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1907 02/1947  
1559 1184 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 12/1907 11/11/1955  
1560 1185 N1 GNR Ivatt 0-6-2T 02/1908 18/03/1957