Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1907 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | C1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1432 | 1171 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 11/1907 | 26/07/1945 | |
1433 | 1172 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 11/1907 | 02/05/1946 | |
1434 | 1173 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 11/1907 | 26/04/1945 | |
1435 | 1174 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 11/1907 | 20/12/1945 | |
1436 | 1175 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 11/1907 | 05/08/1947 | |
1437 | 1186 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 03/1908 | 11/03/1944 | |
1438 | 1187 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 03/1908 | 08/08/1947 | |
1439 | 1188 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 03/1908 | 02/01/1947 | |
1440 | 1189 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 03/1908 | 14/02/1948 | |
1441 | 1190 | C1 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2 | 03/1908 | 21/05/1948 |