Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 06/1907 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | C12 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1541 | 1155 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 07/1907 | 10/01/1958 | |
1542 | 1156 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 07/1907 | 19/10/1956 | |
1543 | 1157 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 07/1907 | 20/04/1953 | |
1544 | 1158 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 07/1907 | 16/06/1958 | |
1545 | 1159 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 07/1907 | 16/03/1957 | |
1546 | 1160 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 08/1907 | 06/1947 | |
1547 | 1161 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 08/1907 | 06/12/1958 | |
1548 | 1162 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 08/1907 | 04/11/1958 | |
1549 | 1163 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 08/1907 | 11/1949 | |
1550 | 1164 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 09/1907 | 12/1938 |