Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 1901 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | J52 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1251 | 944 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 12/1901 | 25/10/1954 | |
1252 | 945 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 12/1901 | 06/05/1957 | |
1253 | 946 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 12/1901 | 31/12/1955 | |
1254 | 947 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 12/1901 | 12/07/1956 | |
1255 | 948 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 12/1901 | 19/07/1954 | |
1256 | 949 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 12/1901 | 14/11/1956 | |
1257 | 950 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 12/1901 | 23/11/1955 | |
1258 | 951 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 12/1901 | 14/04/1958 | |
1259 | 952 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 12/1901 | 16/12/1955 | |
1260 | 953 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 02/1902 | 02/08/1954 | |
1261 | 954 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 01/1902 | 23/12/1957 | |
1262 | 955 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 02/1902 | 10/1955 | |
1263 | 956 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 02/1902 | 13/10/1958 | |
1264 | 957 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 03/1902 | 08/05/1958 | |
1265 | 958 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 03/1902 | 19/10/1955 | |
1266 | 959 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 03/1902 | 27/10/1955 | |
1267 | 960 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 03/1902 | 02/09/1958 | |
1268 | 961 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 04/1902 | 10/02/1958 | |
1269 | 962 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 03/1902 | 28/10/1955 | |
1270 | 963 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 03/1902 | 20/03/1961 |